+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Reconsideration granted.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
On March 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
On February 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
April 7, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
April 7, 2015: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor