+ − Summaries (12)
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 764, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 3392.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 2743.).
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 16. Page 2018.)
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 1856.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16).
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (March 26).
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (March 12).
On February 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
On January 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and JUD.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (12)
September 11, 2019: AB 44 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 6
September 10, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB44 Friedman By Jackson
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 5
August 30, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 9, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2019: AB 44 Friedman Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 12
May 23, 2019: AB 44 Friedman Assembly Third Reading Amend By FRIEDMAN Set #1
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 4
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 16, 2019: Do pass." style="text-align:left"> Noes: Bigelow, Brough, Diep, Obernolte
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 26, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor