+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 723, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 5. Page 3027.).
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2915.)
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2459.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 1766.)
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15).
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On December 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 9, 2015: AB 44 MULLIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
September 3, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB44 Mullin By Hertzberg
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
August 27, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 30, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 30, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2015: AB 44 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 15, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor