+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 161, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2056.).
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HUMAN S.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1359.).
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HUM. S.
On February 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
On February 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
July 11, 2019: Special Consent AB439 Mark Stone Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 24, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
June 11, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 25, 2019: AB 439 Mark Stone Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 9, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 8
March 19, 2019: No Votes Recorded:
- Yeas: 8
March 19, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor