+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 665, Statutes of 2021.
On September 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2875.)
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 2902.).
On September 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 2452.).
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 1634.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
- Coauthors revised.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On February 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
On February 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
September 8, 2021: AB 438 Reyes Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 8
September 7, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB438 Reyes et al. By Hertzberg
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 6
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
July 15, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 5, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 27, 2021: AB 438 Reyes Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 7
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 15, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor