+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 266, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2237.).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1152.)
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
On February 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (5)
August 30, 2021: Consent Calendar AB435
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 21, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 3
April 22, 2021: AB 435 Mullin Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
April 14, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
April 6, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor