+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15).
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23).
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1803.)
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On March 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On March 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On February 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 24, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 23, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
June 23, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
June 2, 2015: AB 435 CHANG Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
March 25, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
March 25, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor