+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3726.)
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23).
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On January 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and REV. & TAX.
On January 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On December 17, 2012 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 16.
On December 14, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 11, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
January 29, 2014: AB 43 BOCANEGRA Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
January 23, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
January 13, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
May 6, 2013: Be referred to Committee on Revenue and Taxation.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor