+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 21).
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & E.
On February 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
On February 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
April 21, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2