+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 424, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3097.).
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2491.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 8).
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1932.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 12).
On March 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
On February 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 9, 2019: AB 426 Maienschein Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
September 4, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB426 Maienschein By Wiener
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 8, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
May 23, 2019: AB 426 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 9
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 3
March 12, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor