+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died on inactive file.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bonta.
- Reconsideration granted. (Page 3097.)
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider on the next legislative day made by Assembly Member Bonta.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 22. Noes 34. Page 1493.).
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 5).
On February 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On February 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2017: AB 423 BONTA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 34
- Present/NV: 24
April 5, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor