+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and HEALTH.
On February 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor