+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died at Desk.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Held at Desk.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to the Senate.
- From inactive file.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Mullin.
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 2).
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after February 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 2781.).
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (January 15).
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On September 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1341.)
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On February 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
April 2, 2014: Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 20, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB418 Mullin By Hill Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 4
January 15, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
June 25, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 11
May 9, 2013: AB 418 MULLIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
May 1, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 9, 2013: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor