+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Durazo.
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Durazo.
On July 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 2).
On June 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 1248.)
On March 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (March 12).
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
On February 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
April 22, 2019: AB 418 Kalra Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 4
March 12, 2019: D Noes: Gallagher, Kiley, Obernolte
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2019: Noes: Gallagher, Kiley, Obernolte
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor