+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 612, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2906.).
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2096.).
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18).
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1576.)
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15).
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On April 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
On April 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
On February 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and JUD.
On February 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 6, 2013: AB 415 GARCIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
September 3, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB415 Garcia By Fuller
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 18, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
May 23, 2013: AB 415 GARCIA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
May 15, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 29, 2013: Be referred to Committee on Utilities and Commerce.
- Yeas: 11
April 29, 2013: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor