+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 340, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3104.).
On September 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2496.).
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Held at Desk.
On August 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to the Senate.
On July 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2129.).
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1857.)
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 11, 2017: AB 415 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
September 6, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB415 Chiu et al. By Leyva
- Yeas: 40
July 20, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd AB415
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 27, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
May 30, 2017: AB 415 CHIU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 24, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 25, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor