+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On December 10, 2012 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 9.
On December 7, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor