+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and AGRI.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1866.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 25).
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
On February 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 19, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
July 2, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
June 25, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Agriculture]
- Yeas: 9
May 23, 2019: AB 409 Limón Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 16, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 18
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
March 25, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor