+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1565.)
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15).
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On February 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 23, 2013: AB 407 PÉREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 5
May 15, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 16, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor