+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor