+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor