+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 339, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1989.).
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 920.)
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 10).
On April 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On February 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 26, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB404 Eggman By Yee
- Yeas: 39
June 3, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
April 15, 2013: AB 404 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
April 10, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 2, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor