+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (40)
On October 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 586, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 8. Page 3292.).
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (September 11).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3197.)
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3195.)
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 2309.).
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (August 20).
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule JR 61(a)(10) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1819.)
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 3. Page 1603.)
On May 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 15).
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 29).
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On April 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and TRANS.
On February 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 12, 2013: AB 401 DALY Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 4
September 11, 2013: Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
September 10, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB401 Daly By DeSaulnier
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
August 26, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
August 20, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
May 24, 2013: AB 401 DALY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 7
May 15, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
April 29, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1