+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 6265.).
On August 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4463.).
On August 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 1153.)
On April 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 17).
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 21, 2014: AB 400 FONG Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 2
August 13, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB400 Fong By Pavley
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
June 4, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 29, 2013: AB 400 FONG Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 2
April 17, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 9, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor