+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On January 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- (pending re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3769.)
On January 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On January 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor