+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On July 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 1714.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On December 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
July 5, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 16, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2021: AB 4 Arambula Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 3
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 13, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor