+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 90, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On June 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2132.).
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1633.).
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1335.)
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28).
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
On February 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
June 28, 2021: AB 398 Fong Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
June 24, 2021: Consent Calendar AB398
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 8, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 6, 2021: AB 398 Fong Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
March 22, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor