+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1740.)
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On May 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On February 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
May 29, 2013: AB 395 FOX Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
May 24, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
April 9, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor