+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 167, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On July 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2353.).
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1875.).
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1108.)
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
July 13, 2015: AB 394 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
July 9, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB394 Mark Stone By Monning
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 9, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
June 9, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
April 23, 2015: AB 394 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
April 23, 2015: AB 394 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
April 15, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 21
April 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 21