+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On February 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 18, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor