+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 609, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3010.).
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2328.).
On August 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 18).
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1626.)
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8).
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
On March 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On March 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On February 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
On February 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 5, 2019: AB 391 Voepel Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2019: Special Consent AB391
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 18, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 13, 2019: AB 391 Voepel Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
May 8, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
April 23, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2019: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor