+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
On February 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
March 25, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor