+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 227, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 12. Page 2982.).
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2496.).
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
- Referred to Coms. on ED., E.Q. and N.R. & W.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 16. Page 1407.)
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 28).
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (March 24).
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and NAT. RES.
On December 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (10)
September 9, 2021: AB 39 Chau Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 12
September 8, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB39 Chau By Skinner
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 21, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 14, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 9, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 13, 2021: AB 39 Chau Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 12
April 28, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
March 24, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor