+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1418.)
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1374.)
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1134.)
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 5).
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (March 14).
On February 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
June 27, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
September 1, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 11, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 13, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 8, 2017: AB 386 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
April 5, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
March 14, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2