+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3123.).
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 2515.).
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 30).
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (July 10).
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and E., U. & C.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2152.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
On February 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 9, 2019: AB 386 Eduardo Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
September 4, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB386 Eduardo Garcia By Hueso
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
August 19, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
July 10, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
July 2, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2019: AB 386 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 16, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 18
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
March 25, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor