+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Stricken from file.
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On October 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3521.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2934.).
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1816.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On February 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
On February 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 15, 2017: AB 381 Calderon Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
September 14, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB381 Calderon et al. By McGuire
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 6
September 1, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
July 10, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 20, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 30, 2017: AB 381 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
March 20, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor