+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 87, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On July 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1876.).
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1189.)
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 3).
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 19).
On February 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
On February 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 1, 2019: Consent Calendar AB381
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 5, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 11, 2019: AB 381 Reyes Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 8
April 3, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
March 19, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor