+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
On January 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On December 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
April 6, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor