+ − Summaries (14)
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (41)
On October 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 391, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3608.).
On September 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 13).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3552.)
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (September 13). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On September 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3512.)
- Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2860.).
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 25).
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and G.O.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 1915.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 16).
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 22).
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 3).
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and NAT. RES.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (12)
September 14, 2019: AB 38 Wood Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
September 13, 2019: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on [Natural Resources]
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 4
September 13, 2019: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
September 11, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB38 Wood et al. By Stern
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 9, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 25, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
May 23, 2019: AB 38 Wood Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 8
May 16, 2019: Noes: Obernolte
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 22, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 3, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources]
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6