+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 50, Statutes of 2021.
On June 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2088.).
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1543.).
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 8).
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1181.)
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1148.)
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From Consent Calendar.
- Ordered to third reading.
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On March 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23).
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
On February 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (5)
June 24, 2021: AB 378 Bauer-Kahan Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
June 17, 2021: Consent Calendar AB378
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 8, 2021: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
April 26, 2021: AB 378 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
March 23, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor