+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On March 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
On February 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
April 21, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1