+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 7, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 327, Statutes of 2023.
On September 20, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 13, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3380.).
On September 12, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2643.).
On September 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On July 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On May 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
On May 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 4, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1461.)
On April 27, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 26, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 25).
On April 5, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On April 4, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 29).
- Read second time and amended.
On February 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUM. S.
On February 2, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
On February 1, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 13, 2023: AB 373 Gipson Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
September 12, 2023: Assembly 3rd Reading AB373 Gipson et al. By Wahab
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 3, 2023: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
June 7, 2023: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 4, 2023: AB 373 Gipson Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
April 25, 2023: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 8
March 29, 2023: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1