+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 75, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:45 p.m.
On July 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1606.).
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1477.)
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8).
On April 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
On April 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 2).
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
On February 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on V.A. and P.E.,R. & S.S.
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
July 1, 2013: Consent Calendar 2nd AB372 Eggman
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 5
June 10, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 5
May 16, 2013: AB 372 EGGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 9
May 8, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 24, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
April 2, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Employees, Retirement and Social Security.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor