+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 390, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2691.).
On August 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1942.).
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 25).
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1218.)
On April 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 23).
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 26, 2013: AB 370 MURATSUCHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
August 22, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB370 Muratsuchi By Padilla
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 10, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 10
May 2, 2013: AB 370 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
April 23, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
April 16, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Arts, Entertain, Sports, Tourism, & Internet Media
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor