+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2021.
On September 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2972.).
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2498.).
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2517.)
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2517.).
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On July 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1759.)
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 20).
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22).
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24).
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED.
On February 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
On February 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (9)
September 9, 2021: AB 367 Cristina Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 8, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB367 Cristina Garcia et a By Skinner
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
September 8, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB367 Cristina Garcia et a By Skinner Reconsider
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 5, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 23, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2021: AB 367 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
April 22, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
March 24, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor