+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 502, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 30. Page 6419.).
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) .
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4958.).
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29).
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1801.)
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (11)
August 30, 2016: AB 366 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 30
August 25, 2016: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
August 15, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB366 Bonta By Hancock
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
June 29, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 15, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
July 15, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
June 2, 2015: AB 366 BONTA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
April 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 3
April 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor