+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On September 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2734.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.)
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2300.).
On August 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1108.)
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
On March 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On February 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 1, 2015: AB 362 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 31, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB362 Waldron By Leyva
- Yeas: 40
June 9, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
June 9, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
April 23, 2015: AB 362 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
April 23, 2015: AB 362 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
April 15, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
March 25, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor