+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1814.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On February 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
On February 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
July 10, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2017: AB 362 WOOD Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 3, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
April 3, 2017: No Votes Recorded:
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor