+ − Summaries (12)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 399, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3200.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3199.)
- Ordered to the unfinished business file.
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On September 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2595.).
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U., & C. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E., U., & C.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1800.)
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27).
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and U. & C.
On February 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (14)
September 11, 2015: AB 361 ACHADJIAN Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
September 8, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB361 Achadjian By Monning Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 40
September 8, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB361 Achadjian By Monning Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 40
August 27, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 7, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
June 29, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 29, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2015: AB 361 ACHADJIAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
April 27, 2015: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
April 27, 2015: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
April 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Commerce] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Commerce] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor