+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 549, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3076.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2231.).
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 2).
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1606.)
On May 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 7).
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
On February 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
September 10, 2013: AB 359 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
September 9, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB359 Holden By Hueso
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
July 2, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2013: AB 359 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading By ALLEN
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 9
May 7, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 10